NJ S1416 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S652
Note: Carry Foward to future A117
Note: Carry Over of previous A3464
Note: Carry Over of previous S1704
Note: Carry Foward to future A117
Note: Carry Over of previous A3464
Note: Carry Over of previous S1704
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits governing body of municipalities having population of 30,000 or less to serve as local board of health; validates certain actions.
Title
Permits governing body of municipalities having population of 30,000 or less to serve as local board of health; validates certain actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1416 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1416 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A139 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3464 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1704 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1416 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A139 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3464 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1704 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee