NJ S4315 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1390
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.459.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.459.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates fund to reimburse local units of government
Title
Creates fund to reimburse local units of government
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Rep. Patricia Jones [D] | Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] |
Rep. Roy Freiman [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A6063 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 53 N: 20 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 53 N: 20 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.459. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (55-19-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Motion To Table Aa (53-20-0) (Egan Jones) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Bramnick) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A6063 (ACS) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-4) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Motion To Table Sa (24-16) (Weinberg) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Motion To Sa (Oroho) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4315 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.459.
A6063 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4315 (SCS)
A6063 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4315 (SCS)