NJ S4275 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1714
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.448.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.448.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows BPU to increase cost to customers of Class I renewable energy requirement for energy years 2022 through 2024, under certain conditions.
Title
Allows BPU to increase cost to customers of Class I renewable energy requirement for energy years 2022 through 2024, under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A6088 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.448. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (58-14-2) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A6088 |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (24-13) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4275 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.448.
A6088 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4275
A6088 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4275