NJ S4218 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 10 2022 - 75% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (49-24-4)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates $2 million to CRDA to support costs associated with hosting NAACP National Convention in Atlantic City.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $2 million to CRDA to support costs associated with hosting NAACP National Convention in Atlantic City.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A6256 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-10AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (49-24-4)
2022-01-10AssemblySubstituted for A6256 (1R)
2022-01-06AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2022-01-06AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2021-12-20AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
2021-12-20SenatePassed by the Senate (27-5)
2021-12-16SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2021-12-06SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A6256 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S4218 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback