NJ A6256 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S4218 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S4218 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $2 million to CRDA to support costs associated with hosting NAACP National Convention in Atlantic City.
Title
Appropriates $2 million to CRDA to support costs associated with hosting NAACP National Convention in Atlantic City.
Sponsors
Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Antwan McClellan [R] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted by S4218 (1R) |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4218 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.426.