NJ S4202 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S93
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Substituted by A5971
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Substituted by A5971
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes NJ Infrastructure Bank to expend additional sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2020.
Title
Authorizes NJ Infrastructure Bank to expend additional sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Senate | Substituted by A5971 |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4202 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Substituted by A5971
A5971 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.515.
A5971 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.515.