NJ S3983 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A5632 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A5632 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain public employees receive additional training to manage harassment or discrimination complaints.
Title
Requires certain public employees receive additional training to manage harassment or discrimination complaints.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | Substituted by A5632 (1R) |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5632 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.348.