NJ A5632 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.348.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.348.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain public employees receive additional training to manage harassment or discrimination complaints.
Title
Requires certain public employees receive additional training to manage harassment or discrimination complaints.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3983 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3983 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.348. |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Substituted for S3983 (1R) |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-1) |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3983 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A5632 (1R)