NJ S3932 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A5841
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A5841
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises certain funding provisions for financial assistance and grants from Hazardous Discharge Site Remediation Fund.
Title
Revises certain funding provisions for financial assistance and grants from Hazardous Discharge Site Remediation Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Substituted by A5841 |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5841 (Same As) 2021-08-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.207.