NJ A5841 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.207.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.207.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revises certain funding provisions for financial assistance and grants from Hazardous Discharge Site Remediation Fund.
Title
Revises certain funding provisions for financial assistance and grants from Hazardous Discharge Site Remediation Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3932 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3932 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-24 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.207. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Substituted for S3932 |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3932 (Same As) 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A5841