NJ S3685 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.431.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes program to increase participation of underrepresented students in New Jersey's science and engineering workforce.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes program to increase participation of underrepresented students in New Jersey's science and engineering workforce.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5345 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.431.
2020-01-09SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
2020-01-06SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-12-16AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (75-2-0)
2019-12-16AssemblySubstituted for A5345 (1R)
2019-12-12AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-12-12AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-12-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-06-20AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
2019-06-20SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2019-06-17SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-06-06SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-05-13SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5345 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3685 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback