NJ S3574 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A196
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.324.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.324.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires NJT to conduct feasibility study on restoring one-seat ride to Manhattan on Raritan Valley Line.
Title
Requires NJT to conduct feasibility study on restoring one-seat ride to Manhattan on Raritan Valley Line.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5256 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.324. |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A5256 |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3574 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.324.
A5256 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3574
A5256 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3574