NJ S3489 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Approved P.L.2021, c.137.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Approved P.L.2021, c.137.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Changes effective date of new law concerning certain State contracts for mental health, behavioral health, and addiction services.
Title
Changes effective date of new law concerning certain State contracts for mental health, behavioral health, and addiction services.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Sen. Richard Codey [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5465 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5465 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.137. |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted for A5465 |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5465 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S3489