NJ S3364 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Approved P.L.2021, c.48.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Approved P.L.2021, c.48.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain licensees to acquire alcoholic beverage license from retail food store that is bankruptcy asset; permits sell, display, and offer for sale alcoholic beverages within physically seperated area in retail food store.
Title
Permits certain licensees to acquire alcoholic beverage license from retail food store that is bankruptcy asset; permits sell, display, and offer for sale alcoholic beverages within physically seperated area in retail food store.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5267 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5267 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.48. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A5267 (ACS) |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Recommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5267 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Substituted by S3364 (SCS/1R)