NJ S3306 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Substituted by A5222 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Substituted by A5222 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes optometrists to administer immunizations against coronaviruses and influenza under certain circumstances.
Title
Authorizes optometrists to administer immunizations against coronaviruses and influenza under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Substituted by A5222 (2R) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5222 (Same As) 2021-05-12 - Approved P.L.2021, c.101.