NJ S3114 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1796
Note: Carry Foward to future S1605
Note: Carry Foward to future S1605
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows members of PERS Prosecutors Part to establish purchased PERS credit in the Part at additional cost.
Title
Allows members of PERS Prosecutors Part to establish purchased PERS credit in the Part at additional cost.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-1) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3114 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S3114 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A5346 (Same As) 2021-05-12 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S3114 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A5346 (Same As) 2021-05-12 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee