NJ S309 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1943
Note: Carry Foward to future A4371
Note: Carry Over of previous S3406
Note: Carry Over of previous A1708
Note: Carry Over of previous S3933
Note: Carry Foward to future A4371
Note: Carry Over of previous S3406
Note: Carry Over of previous A1708
Note: Carry Over of previous S3933
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires workers' compensation, PIP, and health insurance coverage for the medical use of cannabis under certain circumstances.
Title
Requires workers' compensation, PIP, and health insurance coverage for the medical use of cannabis under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S309 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S309 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S3406 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1708 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
A3511 (Same As) 2022-03-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S3933 (Carry Over) 2021-06-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S309 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S3406 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1708 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
A3511 (Same As) 2022-03-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S3933 (Carry Over) 2021-06-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S309 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S0500/309_I1.HTM |