NJ A1708 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future S309
Note: Carry Foward to future A3511
Note: Carry Over of previous A4505

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires workers' compensation, PIP, and health insurance coverage for the medical use of cannabis under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires workers' compensation, PIP, and health insurance coverage for the medical use of cannabis under certain circumstances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2020-10-26AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-02-13AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-01-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1708 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
A1708 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
A4505 (Carry Over) 2018-09-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S3406 (Same As) 2021-02-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback