NJ S3078 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Approved P.L.2019, c.122.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Approved P.L.2019, c.122.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires collection of DNA sample for child pornography arrests.
Title
Requires collection of DNA sample for child pornography arrests.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Nicholas Sacco [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Rep. Eliana Marin [D] |
Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4677 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.122. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Substituted for A4677 |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4677 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S3078