NJ A4677 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S3078
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires collection of DNA sample for child pornography arrests.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires collection of DNA sample for child pornography arrests.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23AssemblySubstituted by S3078
2019-05-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-05-13AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-10-29AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3078 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback