NJ S3056 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - Substituted by A4895
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - Substituted by A4895
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates UI exemption for interns employed by hospitals.
Title
Eliminates UI exemption for interns employed by hospitals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Senate | Substituted by A4895 |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4895 (Same As) 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.230.