NJ A4895 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.230.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.230.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates UI exemption for interns employed by hospitals.
Title
Eliminates UI exemption for interns employed by hospitals.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Egan [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] |
Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3056 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-07 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.230. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Substituted for S3056 |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3056 (Same As) 2017-06-29 - Substituted by A4895