NJ S3046 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-04 - Approved P.L.2022, c.115.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-04 - Approved P.L.2022, c.115.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for child tax credit to be available in Tax Year 2022.
Title
Provides for child tax credit to be available in Tax Year 2022.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-10-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 40 N: 31 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-10-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4640 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 40 N: 31 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-10-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4640 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-04 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2022, c.115. |
2022-10-03 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-4-0) |
2022-10-03 | Assembly | Motion To Table (41-30-0) (Greenwald) |
2022-10-03 | Assembly | Motion To As (Webber) |
2022-10-03 | Assembly | Substituted for A4640 |
2022-09-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2022-09-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (29-6) |
2022-09-22 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
A4640 (Same As) 2022-10-03 - Substituted by S3046