NJ S3023 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A703
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits union officials who represent probation officers to participate in all union activities.
Title
Permits union officials who represent probation officers to participate in all union activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3023 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
A4473 (Same As) 2020-01-06 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4473 (Same As) 2020-01-06 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading