NJ A703 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A932
Note: Carry Over of previous A4473
Note: Carry Over of previous S3023
Note: Carry Over of previous A4473
Note: Carry Over of previous S3023
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits union officials who represent probation officers to participate in all union activities.
Title
Permits union officials who represent probation officers to participate in all union activities.
Sponsors
Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (63-2-13) |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A703 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A4473 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3023 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
A4473 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3023 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading