NJ S2991 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Substituted by A4583
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Substituted by A4583
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $2,988,859 from 2009 Historic Preservation Fund and constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to provide capital preservation grants for certain historic preservation projects.
Title
Appropriates $2,988,859 from 2009 Historic Preservation Fund and constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to provide capital preservation grants for certain historic preservation projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Substituted by A4583 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4583 (Same As) 2017-07-13 - Approved P.L.2017, c.113.