NJ A4583 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-8)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Approved P.L.2017, c.113.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates $2,988,859 from 2009 Historic Preservation Fund and constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to provide capital preservation grants for certain historic preservation projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $2,988,859 from 2009 Historic Preservation Fund and constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to provide capital preservation grants for certain historic preservation projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2991 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-13SenateApproved P.L.2017, c.113.
2017-05-25SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
2017-05-25SenateSubstituted for S2991
2017-05-01SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2017-03-23AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
2017-03-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-02-13AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2017-02-13AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2991 (Same As) 2017-05-25 - Substituted by A4583

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback