NJ S2972 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-26 - Approved P.L.2011, c.89.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-26 - Approved P.L.2011, c.89.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various changes to urban transit hub tax credit program concerning mixed use projects, in-State job relocation, tax credit and investment criteria, and affordable housing; makes certain NJ Meadowlands area properties eligible for incentive grants.*
Title
Makes various changes to urban transit hub tax credit program concerning mixed use projects, in-State job relocation, tax credit and investment criteria, and affordable housing; makes certain NJ Meadowlands area properties eligible for incentive grants.*
Sponsors
Rep. Alberto Coutinho [D] | Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Sen. Raymond Lesniak [D] | Sen. Donald Norcross [D] |
Rep. Jason O'Donnell [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-26 | Approved P.L.2011, c.89. | |
2011-06-29 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-6-1) | |
2011-06-29 | Substituted for A4161 (ACS) | |
2011-06-29 | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-29 | Passed by the Senate (36-0) | |
2011-06-27 | Senate Amendment (16-0) (Lesniak) | |
2011-06-23 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-20 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4199 (Same As) 2011-06-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee