NJ S2969 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Approved P.L.2024, c.8.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Approved P.L.2024, c.8.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides counties discretion related to retirement of county debt service and amount that can be raised under property tax levy cap.
Title
Provides counties discretion related to retirement of county debt service and amount that can be raised under property tax levy cap.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4044 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4044 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Approved P.L.2024, c.8. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0) |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (53-22-2) |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Substituted for A4044 (2R) |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Pintor Marin) |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4044 (Same As) 2024-03-18 - Substituted by S2969 (2R)