NJ S2944 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.180.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.180.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain council members to appoint up to four fulltime equivalent aides; allows these aide positions to be divided into part-time positions.
Title
Permits certain council members to appoint up to four fulltime equivalent aides; allows these aide positions to be divided into part-time positions.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Rep. Eliana Marin [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4509 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4509 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.180. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (28-9) |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (58-16-1) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A4509 (1R) |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-2) |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Transferred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2018-09-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4509 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S2944 (2R)