NJ S2892 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Eliminates certain aviation fuel tax exemptions; provides funding for aviation capital projects.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminates certain aviation fuel tax exemptions; provides funding for aviation capital projects.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4392 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 31 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-01-31AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (42-31-0)
2019-01-31AssemblySubstituted for A4392 (2R)
2018-12-10AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-10-18AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-10-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
2018-09-27SenatePassed by the Senate (21-18)
2018-09-24SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-09-13SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-09-13SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading without recommendation
2018-08-27SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4392 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S2892 (4R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback