NJ A4392 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3370
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on September 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S2892 (4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S2892 (4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates certain aviation fuel tax exemptions; provides funding for aviation capital projects.*
Title
Eliminates certain aviation fuel tax exemptions; provides funding for aviation capital projects.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Substituted by S2892 (4R) |
2018-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-09-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4392 (Carry Over) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S2892 (4R)
S2892 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
S2892 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence