NJ S2888 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A479
Note: Carry Over of previous S1543
Note: Carry Over of previous S1543
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows corporation business tax and gross income tax credits to businesses employing certain persons with developmental disabilities.
Title
Allows corporation business tax and gross income tax credits to businesses employing certain persons with developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3462 (Same As) 2024-02-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee
A479 (Carry Over) 2022-06-09 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S1543 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A479 (Carry Over) 2022-06-09 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S1543 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2888 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3000/2888_I1.HTM |