NJ A479 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3462
Note: Carry Foward to future S2888
Note: Carry Over of previous A2623
Note: Carry Over of previous S2806
Note: Carry Foward to future S2888
Note: Carry Over of previous A2623
Note: Carry Over of previous S2806
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows corporation business tax and gross income tax credits to businesses employing certain persons with developmental disabilities.
Title
Allows corporation business tax and gross income tax credits to businesses employing certain persons with developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. William Moen [D] | Rep. Brandon Umba [R] | Rep. James Kennedy [D] |
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A479 (Carry Over) 2022-06-09 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A479 (Carry Over) 2022-06-09 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A2623 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S2806 (Carry Over) 2020-08-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S1543 (Same As) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A479 (Carry Over) 2022-06-09 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A2623 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S2806 (Carry Over) 2020-08-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S1543 (Same As) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee