NJ S2884 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.199.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.199.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Declares that deed restrictions or agreements that prevent raising or constructing of a structure to certain flood elevation standards are unenforceable.
Title
Declares that deed restrictions or agreements that prevent raising or constructing of a structure to certain flood elevation standards are unenforceable.
Sponsors
Sen. James Whelan [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] |
Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Rep. Marlene Caride [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4484 Aa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4484 Aa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-07 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.199. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A4484 (1R) |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Tucker) |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4484 (Same As) 2017-06-08 - Substituted by S2884 (1R)