NJ S2859 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5764
Note: Carry Over of previous S4242
Note: Carry Over of previous S4242
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits planting of non-native species in landscaping at State parks and forests; establishes grant program to support use of native plants at local parks and forests; appropriates $250,000.
Title
Prohibits planting of non-native species in landscaping at State parks and forests; establishes grant program to support use of native plants at local parks and forests; appropriates $250,000.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1253 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee
A5764 (Carry Over) 2023-11-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee
S4242 (Carry Over) 2023-12-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A5764 (Carry Over) 2023-11-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee
S4242 (Carry Over) 2023-12-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2859 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3000/2859_I1.HTM |