NJ A1253 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5764
Note: Carry Over of previous S4242
Note: Carry Over of previous S4242
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee
Pending: Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee
Pending: Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits planting of non-native species in landscaping at State parks and forests; establishes grant program to support use of native plants at local parks and forests; appropriates $250,000.
Title
Prohibits planting of non-native species in landscaping at State parks and forests; establishes grant program to support use of native plants at local parks and forests; appropriates $250,000.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5764 (Carry Over) 2023-11-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee
S4242 (Carry Over) 2023-12-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S2859 (Same As) 2024-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S4242 (Carry Over) 2023-12-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S2859 (Same As) 2024-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A1253 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A1500/1253_I1.HTM |