NJ S2830 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-29 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-29 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends for three years application submission deadline to EDA for review and approval of certain construction projects involving public institutions of higher education.
Title
Extends for three years application submission deadline to EDA for review and approval of certain construction projects involving public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-29 | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-29 | Passed by the Senate (38-0) | |
2011-05-19 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-11 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4103 (Same As) 2011-06-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading