NJ S2771 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2243
Note: Carry Foward to future A4107
Note: Carry Over of previous S1857
Note: Carry Over of previous A1055
Note: Carry Foward to future A4107
Note: Carry Over of previous S1857
Note: Carry Over of previous A1055
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-30 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-30 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes five-year community schools pilot program.
Title
Establishes five-year community schools pilot program.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Sen. Renee Burgess [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-29 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-29 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (27-6) |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-09-29 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-09-29 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2771 (Carry Over) 2023-06-30 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
S2771 (Carry Over) 2023-06-30 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
A1168 (Same As) 2023-06-27 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1857 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1055 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2771 (Carry Over) 2023-06-30 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
A1168 (Same As) 2023-06-27 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1857 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1055 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee