NJ A1055 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1168
Note: Carry Foward to future S2771
Note: Carry Over of previous A4078
Note: Carry Over of previous S2981
Note: Carry Foward to future S2771
Note: Carry Over of previous A4078
Note: Carry Over of previous S2981
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes five-year community schools pilot program.
Title
Establishes five-year community schools pilot program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (57-18-1) |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1055 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1055 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4078 (Carry Over) 2018-06-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S1857 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2981 (Carry Over) 2018-09-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A1055 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4078 (Carry Over) 2018-06-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S1857 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2981 (Carry Over) 2018-09-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee