NJ S2744 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4147 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4147 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts and nonpublic schools to conduct audit of security features of district buildings, grounds, and communication systems and to submit audit to NJ Office of Homeland Security and Preparedness and DOE.*
Title
Requires school districts and nonpublic schools to conduct audit of security features of district buildings, grounds, and communication systems and to submit audit to NJ Office of Homeland Security and Preparedness and DOE.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A4147 (2R) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment (28-0) (Ruiz) |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4147 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.478.