NJ S2731 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-11)
Status: Passed on February 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - Approved P.L.2017, c.13.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-11)
Status: Passed on February 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - Approved P.L.2017, c.13.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes New Jersey Environmental Infrastructure Trust to expend additional sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2017.
Title
Authorizes New Jersey Environmental Infrastructure Trust to expend additional sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4326 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-03 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-03 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-06 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.13. |
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-1) |
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Substituted for A4326 |
2016-12-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-11-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-11-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-0) |
2016-11-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-11-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4326 (Same As) 2016-12-19 - Substituted by S2731