NJ S2697 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-10-28 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-10-28 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain motor vehicles to display both amber and green warning lights.
Title
Permits certain motor vehicles to display both amber and green warning lights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-10-28 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz) |
2024-06-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3496 (Same As) 2025-03-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading