NJ S2695 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S350
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.239.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.239.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires MVC conduct study and make recommendations concerning electronic driver's licenses and mobile applications.
Title
Requires MVC conduct study and make recommendations concerning electronic driver's licenses and mobile applications.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Sen. Nicholas Sacco [D] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4110 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4110 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.239. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted for A4110 (1R) |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2695 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.239.
A4110 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2695 (1R)
A4110 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2695 (1R)