NJ S2691 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Approved P.L.2021, c.35.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Approved P.L.2021, c.35.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes school districts to maintain surplus at four percent for 2020-2021 and 2021-2022 school years.
Title
Authorizes school districts to maintain surplus at four percent for 2020-2021 and 2021-2022 school years.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4310 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4310 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.35. |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-2-0) |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Substituted for A4310 (1R) |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Senate Amendment (24-0) (Greenstein) |
2020-09-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4310 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Substituted by S2691 (1R)