NJ S2667 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3285
Note: Carry Over of previous S2308
Note: Carry Over of previous S2308
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for preparation and distribution of written notice to senior citizens concerning risks and prevention of fraud and identity theft.
Title
Provides for preparation and distribution of written notice to senior citizens concerning risks and prevention of fraud and identity theft.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A464 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee
A3285 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
S2308 (Carry Over) 2022-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3285 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
S2308 (Carry Over) 2022-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2667 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3000/2667_I1.HTM |