NJ S2664 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employees of institutions of higher education who assist student victims of sexual assault to receive victim-centered training and students participating in student organizations or athletic programs to receive campus sexual assault prevention training.*
Title
Requires employees of institutions of higher education who assist student victims of sexual assault to receive victim-centered training and students participating in student organizations or athletic programs to receive campus sexual assault prevention training.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4053 (Same As) 2015-01-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee