NJ S2662 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A467
Note: Carry Over of previous S1239
Note: Carry Over of previous S1239
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain accessible public restroom facilities be equipped with signs reserving use for persons with disabilities.
Title
Requires certain accessible public restroom facilities be equipped with signs reserving use for persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3477 (Same As) 2024-02-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee
A467 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S1239 (Carry Over) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A467 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S1239 (Carry Over) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2662 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3000/2662_I1.HTM |