NJ S2627 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.238.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.238.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates State Highway Route 17 in Borough of Ramsey as "Staff Sergeant Timothy R. McGill Memorial Highway."
Title
Designates State Highway Route 17 in Borough of Ramsey as "Staff Sergeant Timothy R. McGill Memorial Highway."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3957 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.238. |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted for A3957 |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3957 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2627