NJ A3957 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2627
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2627
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates State Highway Route 17 in Borough of Ramsey as "Staff Sergeant Timothy R. McGill Memorial Highway."
Title
Designates State Highway Route 17 in Borough of Ramsey as "Staff Sergeant Timothy R. McGill Memorial Highway."
Sponsors
Sen. Holly Schepisi [R] | Rep. Robert Auth [R] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Rep. Scott Rumana [R] |
Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted by S2627 |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2627 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.238.